Splunk board of directors
WebGary Steele is Splunk’s President and Chief Executive Officer and a member of our board of directors. A highly regarded technology executive with over 30 years of experience, he has a proven track record of successfully … Web17 Nov 2024 · Data platform provider Splunk has announced that CEO Doug Merritt is stepping down after six years in the role, with Graham Smith, chair of the firm’s Board of Directors, appointed interim CEO.
Splunk board of directors
Did you know?
WebRisk & Business Continuity Management; Quality Management; Corporate Responsibility; Diversity, Equity, and Inclusion. About GF in Europe Web28 Jul 2024 · Brings Nearly 30 Years of Financial Expertise in U.S., Europe and Latin America Markets. SAN FRANCISCO–(BUSINESS WIRE)–Splunk Inc. (NASDAQ: SPLK), the data platform leader for security and observability, today announced that Luis Felipe Visoso has been appointed to the Splunk Board of Directors, effective immediately. Visoso currently …
Web13 Sep 2024 · SAN FRANCISCO – September 13, 2024 – Splunk Inc. (NASDAQ: SPLK), provider of the leading software platform for real-time Operational Intelligence, today … Web22 Apr 2013 · SAN FRANCISCO - April 22, 2013 - Splunk Inc. (NASDAQ: SPLK), the leading software platform for real-time operational intelligence, today announced that Patricia B. …
Web6 Apr 2024 · SAN FRANCISCO, April 06, 2024 -- ( BUSINESS WIRE )-- Splunk Inc. (NASDAQ: SPLK), the data platform leader for security and observability, today announced that Luis Felipe Visoso has been... Web25 Mar 2024 · Splunk announced that Graham Smith, former chief financial officer of Salesforce, has been appointed as its Chairman of the Board of Directors. Additionally, Sri …
WebBoard Member, Disney, Procter & Gamble, and SambaNova. Amy serves on the board of directors for Disney, Procter & Gamble, and SambaNova and has previously served on the boards of Cisco, Splunk, Marqeta, and Informatica, which encompass nearly a trillion dollars in total market cap. Post-acquisition of her startup Accompany by Cisco for $270M ...
Web1 Dec 2024 · Splunk Board of Directors Appointments: Richard P. Wallace, President and CEO of KLA Corporation, and David Tunnell, Partner at Hellman & Friedman, were appointed to the Splunk Board of Directors. It was announced that Stephen G. Newberry will be stepping down from the Board, joining Sara Baack, as previously announced. ... include a word count in an essayWebSAN FRANCISCO – November 12, 2024 – Splunk Inc. (NASDAQ: SPLK), provider of the Data-to-Everything Platform, today announced that retired Army General Dennis Via has joined Splunk’s Board of Directors, bringing more than 40 years of military, technology and public sector leadership experience to the role. inc icpcWeb12 Oct 2024 · Splunk’s Board has undergone significant change to reflect the dynamic nature of its business and the technology industry. With the appointments of Messrs. … include a video in powerpointWebOverview. Enterprise See how you can align global teams, build and scale business-driven solutions, and enable IT to manage risk and maintain compliance on the platform for dynamic work.; Solutions. Modern Project & Portfolio Management Connect projects with organization strategy. Ensure portfolio success and deliver impact at scale. Marketing & … inc iahWeb11 Apr 2024 · 85.71. EUR. +0.14%. 03/23. SPLUNK INC Management's Discussion and Analysis of Financial Condition and Results of Operations (form 10-K) AQ. 03/21. Splunk Inc : Change in Directors or Principal Officers (form 8-K) AQ. include absacc.hWeb2 Mar 2024 · Splunk Inc. (NASDAQ: SPLK), the data platform leader for security and observability, today announced that Gary Steele has been appointed Chief Executi Splunk … include absacc.h 是什么意思WebChrysty leads legal, regulatory, public policy and communications, compliance, and security operations across Block. A longtime leader of Block’s legal team, she previously held positions at Electronic Arts Inc., served as a Deputy Attorney General at the California Department of Justice, and was an associate at Farella, Braun + Martel. include a working thesis